U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2023
  • December 21, 2023: [Order]
  • December 21, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2023
  • November 28, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2023
  • July 25, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 11, 2023: [Order]
  • July 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Order]
  • April 20, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 20, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 20, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 20, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 06, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • April 06, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.