U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHALEY, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 25, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 25, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 24, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 12, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2023
  • September 29, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 28, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 25, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 14, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
June, 2023
  • June 29, 2023: [Order]
  • June 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 26, 2023: [Order]
  • June 26, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 26, 2023: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2023: [Order]
  • June 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • June 15, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 02, 2023: [Strike]
May, 2023
  • May 25, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • May 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 09, 2023: [Order]
  • May 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2023: [Suppress]
April, 2023
  • April 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 25, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 25, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 25, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 10, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.