U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOCHETT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 04, 2024: [Order]
  • January 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
August, 2023
  • August 17, 2023: [Continue Trial]
May, 2023
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.