U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 24, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 24, 2023: [Seal]
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 11, 2023: [Order]
  • July 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2023: [Oral Order]
May, 2023
  • May 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 12, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.