U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOSLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 17, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 10, 2024: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2024: [Order]
  • January 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2023
  • November 07, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order]
  • November 07, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • October 02, 2023: [Order]
  • October 02, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 29, 2023: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2023
  • June 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • June 08, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2023
  • May 15, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2023
  • April 14, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2023: [Order]
  • April 13, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.