U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. REESE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 13, 2023: [Order]
  • December 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
September, 2023
  • September 12, 2023: [Variance]
  • September 12, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
June, 2023
  • June 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2023
  • May 24, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 24, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2023: [Order]
  • April 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2023: [Order]
  • April 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2023: [Detention]
  • April 14, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.