U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOLDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 28, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 27, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 27, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • November 08, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order]
  • November 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 06, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 06, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • September 06, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • September 06, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • September 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2023
  • August 25, 2023: [Strike]
  • August 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 18, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
June, 2023
  • June 05, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
April, 2023
  • April 14, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 14, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.