U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00302-1
  • Case Name: USA v. REGINALD NELSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 01, 2023: [Judgment]
October, 2023
  • October 23, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2023: [Continue]
August, 2023
  • August 15, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2023
  • July 21, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • July 05, 2023: [Order]
  • July 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2023
  • June 22, 2023: [Process Receipt and Return]
May, 2023
  • May 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 09, 2023: [Order]
  • May 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 19, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2023: [Order]
  • April 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2023: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.