U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez-Sanchez - Interpreter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2023: [Continue]
  • December 19, 2023: [Order]
  • December 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 13, 2023: [Continue Trial]
October, 2023
  • October 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2023: [Order]
August, 2023
  • August 07, 2023: [Release from Custody]
July, 2023
  • July 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 17, 2023: [Order]
  • July 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
May, 2023
  • May 02, 2023: [Order]
  • May 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2023
  • April 28, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • April 17, 2023: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.