U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 02, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 01, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 01, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
September, 2023
  • September 21, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2023
  • August 22, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2023
  • May 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 18, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 18, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • April 17, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.