U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NOEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Order]
  • January 19, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2024: [Continue Trial]
December, 2023
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2023
  • November 21, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
September, 2023
  • September 08, 2023: [Continue Trial - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2023: [Continue Trial]
July, 2023
  • July 19, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • July 13, 2023: [Indictment]
June, 2023
  • June 26, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 26, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 26, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • June 26, 2023: [Order]
  • June 26, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • June 26, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2023
  • April 24, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 18, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.