U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00375-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 12, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
December, 2023
  • December 28, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
November, 2023
  • November 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2023: [Order]
  • November 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2023
  • August 11, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • August 07, 2023: [Order]
  • August 04, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 04, 2023: [Continue Trial]
May, 2023
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 20, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • April 19, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.