U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PATRICK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2023
  • September 20, 2023: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 05, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
May, 2023
  • May 11, 2023: [Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • May 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2023
  • April 24, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.