U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAUSANE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 04, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2023
  • September 28, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 26, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
June, 2023
  • June 08, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2023
  • May 16, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 16, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 15, 2023: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • May 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • May 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 01, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2023
  • April 28, 2023: [Order]
  • April 28, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • April 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.