U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
December, 2023
  • December 19, 2023: [Seal]
  • December 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [Order]
  • November 16, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 10, 2023: [Order]
  • October 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2023
  • September 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 19, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2023
  • August 28, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 28, 2023: [Order]
  • August 28, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2023: [Order]
  • August 22, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 22, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 22, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2023: [Continue Trial]
June, 2023
  • June 22, 2023: [Order]
  • June 21, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2023: [Detention]
May, 2023
  • May 02, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.