U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHITLOW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 11, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 05, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
September, 2023
  • September 21, 2023: [Extend Time]
  • September 08, 2023: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
June, 2023
  • June 26, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 12, 2023: [Order]
  • June 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2023: [Suppress]
May, 2023
  • May 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 04, 2023: [Order]
  • May 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • May 04, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 04, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • May 04, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • May 03, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.