U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. East
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 27, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 23, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
July, 2023
  • July 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2023
  • May 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2023: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.