U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Supervision]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Judgment]
  • October 10, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
September, 2023
  • September 28, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 26, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 12, 2023: [Order]
  • July 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2023: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2023
  • May 15, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.