U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NESBITT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 11, 2023: [Order]
  • October 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 11, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
August, 2023
  • August 04, 2023: [Travel]
July, 2023
  • July 19, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 18, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
June, 2023
  • June 29, 2023: [Order]
  • June 29, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
May, 2023
  • May 19, 2023: [Order]
  • May 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2023: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 18, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2023: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 17, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.