U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOWARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Status Report ]
December, 2023
  • December 21, 2023: [Order]
  • December 21, 2023: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K1.1]
  • December 13, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • December 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2023: [Order]
  • December 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • December 05, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • December 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K1.1]
  • December 04, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2023
  • November 28, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 28, 2023: [Downward Departure - SEALED - 5K1.1 ONLY]
  • November 21, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • November 15, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2023
  • October 03, 2023: [Order]
  • October 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2023
  • September 01, 2023: [Order]
  • September 01, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2023: [Order]
  • August 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2023: [Order]
  • August 10, 2023: [Order]
  • August 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • August 09, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • August 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2023: [Order]
  • August 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2023: [Hearing]
  • August 02, 2023: [Order]
July, 2023
  • July 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 13, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 12, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 11, 2023: [Seal]
  • July 11, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2023: [Strike]
  • July 01, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2023
  • June 29, 2023: [Order]
  • June 26, 2023: [Bond]
  • June 26, 2023: [Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • June 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 02, 2023: [Release from Custody]
May, 2023
  • May 31, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.