U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2023
  • August 21, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
July, 2023
  • July 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2023
  • June 06, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.