U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dorris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2023
  • September 27, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 21, 2023: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 20, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 14, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2023
  • July 21, 2023: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • July 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2023
  • June 30, 2023: [Order]
  • June 30, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 28, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 28, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • June 28, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • June 21, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • June 09, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.