U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holmes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 20, 2023: [Order]
  • October 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
August, 2023
  • August 14, 2023: [Order]
  • August 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 24, 2023: [Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • July 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2023
  • June 21, 2023: [Order]
  • June 21, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • June 20, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • June 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • June 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.