U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSEBORO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Availability of ROA]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Transcript Order Form]
  • October 08, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 08, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 08, 2024: [Appeal Instructions]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2023
  • November 09, 2023: [Discovery]
  • November 07, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order]
  • November 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2023
  • October 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2023
  • September 07, 2023: [Juror Questionnaire Certification]
August, 2023
  • August 22, 2023: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • August 22, 2023: [Acquittal ]
  • August 20, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • August 15, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • August 14, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 14, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 14, 2023: [Order]
  • August 14, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 09, 2023: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • August 08, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 07, 2023: [In Limine]
July, 2023
  • July 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 11, 2023: [Order]
  • July 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 13, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.