U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00177-3
  • Case Name: USA v. DOYLE, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Per Curiam Opinion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2024
  • January 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 08, 2024: [Order]
  • January 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2024: [Order]
  • January 03, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
November, 2023
  • November 29, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 27, 2023: [Response to Court Order]
  • November 06, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2023
  • October 04, 2023: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2023: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2023
  • September 24, 2023: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 21, 2023: [Order]
  • September 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
August, 2023
  • August 24, 2023: [Order]
  • August 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 26, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 25, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 25, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • July 21, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 21, 2023: [Order]
  • July 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2023: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 14, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • July 12, 2023: [Appear]
  • July 11, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2023: [Status Report ]
  • July 05, 2023: [Order]
  • July 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2023
  • June 21, 2023: [Brief/Response in Opposition]
  • June 21, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 21, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2023: [Order]
  • June 16, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • June 16, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 16, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • June 16, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 15, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • June 15, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.