U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCKEITHEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 29, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 29, 2023: [Order]
  • November 29, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 28, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 28, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 28, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 28, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • November 28, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • November 09, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
July, 2023
  • July 26, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2023
  • June 21, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.