U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Judgment]
October, 2023
  • October 25, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 25, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • October 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • October 25, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 18, 2023: [Variance]
September, 2023
  • September 19, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2023
  • July 13, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • July 13, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • July 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • July 13, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • July 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 13, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2023
  • June 28, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 28, 2023: [Order]
  • June 28, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2023: [Order]
  • June 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.