U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference Order]
November, 2023
  • November 14, 2023: [Continue Trial]
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2023
  • July 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 03, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • July 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.