U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
July, 2023
  • July 25, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 25, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • July 25, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 07, 2023: [Order]
  • July 07, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 05, 2023: [Order]
  • July 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.