U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Summerlin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2023
  • December 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2023: [Sentencing]
November, 2023
  • November 08, 2023: [Dismiss]
September, 2023
  • September 26, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2023
  • August 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2023: [Order]
July, 2023
  • July 28, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2023: [Order]
  • July 18, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • July 18, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.