U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00230-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McBRIDE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2023
  • November 08, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • November 08, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • November 07, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2023
  • October 13, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
September, 2023
  • September 15, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
July, 2023
  • July 21, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2023: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.