U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DOBSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 12, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 12, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • January 12, 2024: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 09, 2024: [Information - Felony]
  • January 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2024: [Order]
  • January 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 08, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 08, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2023: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
August, 2023
  • August 31, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
July, 2023
  • July 26, 2023: [Order]
  • July 26, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 26, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.