U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Per Curiam Opinion]
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference Order]
November, 2023
  • November 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2023
  • October 25, 2023: [Release from Custody]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 21, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2023
  • August 01, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
July, 2023
  • July 28, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2023: [Order]
  • July 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • July 27, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.