U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SCOTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • October 08, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Exparte Document - use ONLY with other selection]
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 07, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Order]
  • January 19, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2024: [Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 04, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 03, 2024: [Order]
  • January 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2023
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2023
  • November 03, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order]
  • November 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2023: [Continue Trial]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • September 22, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2023
  • August 25, 2023: [Order]
  • August 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • August 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • August 08, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • August 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2023: [Detention]
  • August 08, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.