U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 14, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 14, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • May 07, 2025: [Variance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [In Limine]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Order]
  • January 19, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 19, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2024: [Continue Trial]
  • January 17, 2024: [Order]
  • January 17, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
December, 2023
  • December 04, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2023
  • August 17, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • August 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.