U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JARRETT, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2024
  • January 12, 2024: [Order]
  • January 12, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • November 07, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2023
  • September 26, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2023: [Order]
  • September 26, 2023: [Oral Order]
August, 2023
  • August 25, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 24, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.