U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00235-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Webster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Order]
  • January 16, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 16, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
October, 2023
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
September, 2023
  • September 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 05, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2023
  • August 31, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • August 31, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.