U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00265-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCNEAR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Seal]
December, 2023
  • December 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order]
  • November 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • November 06, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • November 06, 2023: [Continue]
  • November 06, 2023: [Transcript]
October, 2023
  • October 24, 2023: [Suppress]
  • October 11, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • October 10, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2023
  • September 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • September 08, 2023: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.