U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00298-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bolton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Status Report ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2023
  • October 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 25, 2023: [Order]
  • September 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 19, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.