U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00296-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mangum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2023
  • December 28, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • December 06, 2023: [Transcript]
November, 2023
  • November 27, 2023: [Order]
  • November 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2023: [Order]
  • November 16, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 14, 2023: [Juror Questionnaire Certification]
  • November 14, 2023: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • November 14, 2023: [Acquittal ]
  • November 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2023: [Trial Brief]
  • November 07, 2023: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • November 06, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 06, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 03, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 03, 2023: [Order]
  • November 02, 2023: [Status Conference]
October, 2023
  • October 30, 2023: [In Limine]
  • October 30, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2023: [Order]
  • October 18, 2023: [Order]
  • October 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 17, 2023: [Oral Order]
September, 2023
  • September 25, 2023: [Order]
  • September 25, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 19, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.