U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00315-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 09, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2023
  • October 16, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2023: [Order]
  • October 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 10, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 10, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • October 10, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 05, 2023: [Order]
September, 2023
  • September 22, 2023: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.