U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00258-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FLUELLEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 09, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
November, 2023
  • November 09, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 09, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 09, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • November 09, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
October, 2023
  • October 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2023: [Order]
  • October 02, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • October 02, 2023: [Detention]
  • October 02, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.