U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00313-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KILLINGSWORTH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Order]
  • January 18, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2024: [Continue Trial]
  • January 17, 2024: [Continue Trial - Ends of Justice]
December, 2023
  • December 21, 2023: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2023: [Suppress]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 11, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2023
  • October 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2023: [Strike]
  • October 05, 2023: [Order]
  • October 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • October 03, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.