U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00309-3
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2023
  • October 27, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2023: [Order]
  • October 27, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • October 25, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • October 25, 2023: [Detention]
  • October 25, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2023: [Release from Custody]
  • October 17, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2023: [Order]
  • October 10, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 10, 2023: [Order]
  • October 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.