U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00322-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKeithen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2023
  • December 20, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 20, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • December 20, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • December 20, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2023: [Appear]
October, 2023
  • October 19, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 19, 2023: [Rule 20 - Transfer In ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.