U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00241-2
  • Case Name: USA v. GREEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 12, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2023
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order]
  • November 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2023
  • October 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 23, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.