U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 11, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2024: [Continue Trial]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 13, 2023: [Travel]
November, 2023
  • November 01, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2023: [Order]
  • November 01, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 01, 2023: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2023: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • November 01, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2023: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
October, 2023
  • October 23, 2023: [Order]
  • October 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.