U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00259-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KEITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Continue Trial]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2023
  • December 20, 2023: [Transcript]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 06, 2023: [Continue Trial]
November, 2023
  • November 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 08, 2023: [Seal]
October, 2023
  • October 26, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2023: [Order]
  • October 26, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.