U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00309-2
  • Case Name: USA v. GOLDEN, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K1.1]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 15, 2025: [Downward Departure - SEALED - 5K1.1 ONLY]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Seal Document]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 26, 2024: [Juror Questionnaire Certification]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2024: [Jury Trial]
  • September 26, 2024: [Jury Selection]
  • September 26, 2024: [Jury Verdict ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Jury Instructions ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment - Redacted]
January, 2024
  • January 08, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
November, 2023
  • November 15, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2023: [Order]
  • November 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2023
  • October 30, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • October 30, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 30, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.