U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00358-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 09, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 09, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2023
  • November 15, 2023: [Order]
  • November 14, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2023: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 01, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.